This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/01/2023 at 11:02:56 (UTC).

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020 4 -VS- NANCY S GERRITY

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020 4 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NANCY S GERRITY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1063

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020 4

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

TRUIST BANK

NANCY S GERRITY

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

SUNTRUST BANK

SUNTRUST BANK CENTRAL FLORIDA NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAN ZION

Defendant Attorney

K MATTINGLY

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT $114,480.05 / SALE DATE 5/9/23 - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/22/23 Instrument: 2023026191

03/22/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT $114,480.05 / SALE DATE 5/9/23 - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/22/23 Instrument: 2023026191

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/22/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PLTF

03/23/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PLTF

NOTICE OF FILING FCLR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CHECKLIST BY PLTF

03/03/2023: NOTICE OF FILING FCLR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CHECKLIST BY PLTF

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF

03/02/2023: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC/VIRTUAL APPEARANCE BY PLTF

02/21/2023: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC/VIRTUAL APPEARANCE BY PLTF

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS BY PLTF (ELECTRONICALLY FILED)

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS BY PLTF (ELECTRONICALLY FILED)

ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTLEY - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 2/24/23

02/27/2023: ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTLEY - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 2/24/23

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) MAR 22 2023 @9:30AM

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) MAR 22 2023 @9:30AM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

05/09/2022: VALUE SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

05/09/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022056310

05/09/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022056310

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION BY PLTF

05/09/2022: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION BY PLTF

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT THOMAS E GERRITY

05/09/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT THOMAS E GERRITY

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT NANCY S GERRITY

05/09/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT NANCY S GERRITY

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY FRAN E ZION OBO PLTF

05/09/2022: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY FRAN E ZION OBO PLTF

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGMENT PLAN

05/09/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGMENT PLAN

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingType: FORECLOSURE SALE; DATE / TIME: 05/09/2023 / 1100 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURT ROOM: D; JUDGE: FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT $114,480.05 / SALE DATE 5/9/23 - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/22/23 Instrument: 2023026191

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FCLR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CHECKLIST BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) MAR 22 2023 @9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTLEY - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 2/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS BY PLTF (ELECTRONICALLY FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC/VIRTUAL APPEARANCE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - NANCY S GERRITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY FRAN E ZION OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT NANCY S GERRITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT THOMAS E GERRITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022056310

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less