Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/29/2020 at 13:33:42 (UTC).

THUY THI THU TRUONG -VS- LEROY S CODY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 THUY THI THU TRUONG filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LEROY S CODY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0284

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THUY THI THU TRUONG

Sanford, FL 32771

Defendants

CLYDE LITTLES

Sanford, FL 32771

LEROY S CODY

Sanford, FL 32771

WILLIE LEE HILL JR

Sanford, FL 32771

PATRICIA LASHELLE

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

WRIT RETURNED SERVED

02/18/2020: WRIT RETURNED SERVED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO LEROY S CODY CLYDE LITTLES PATRICIA LASHELLE & WILLIE LEE HILL JR - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/6/20 Instrument: 2020014873

02/07/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO LEROY S CODY CLYDE LITTLES PATRICIA LASHELLE & WILLIE LEE HILL JR - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/6/20 Instrument: 2020014873

WRIT ISSUED O/C SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

02/07/2020: WRIT ISSUED O/C SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

01/24/2020: COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D LEORY S CODY O/C TO PLTF

01/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D LEORY S CODY O/C TO PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D PATRICIA LASHELLE O/C TO PLTF

01/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D PATRICIA LASHELLE O/C TO PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D CLYDE LITTLES O/C TO PLTF

01/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D CLYDE LITTLES O/C TO PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D HILL WILLIE LEE JR O/C TO PLTF

01/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - 5D HILL WILLIE LEE JR O/C TO PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING LEROY S CODY & WILLIE LEE HILL JR & PATRICIA LASHELLE & CLYDE LITTLES

01/27/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING LEROY S CODY & WILLIE LEE HILL JR & PATRICIA LASHELLE & CLYDE LITTLES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - CLYDE LITTLES ON 1/28/20

01/30/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - CLYDE LITTLES ON 1/28/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - LEROY S CODY ON 1/28/20

01/30/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - LEROY S CODY ON 1/28/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - PATRICA LASTELLE ON 1/28/20

01/30/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - PATRICA LASTELLE ON 1/28/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - WILLIE LEE HILL JR ON 1/28/20

01/30/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - WILLIE LEE HILL JR ON 1/28/20

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I AGAINST DEFTS - 2/4/20

02/04/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I AGAINST DEFTS - 2/4/20

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED O/C SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO LEROY S CODY CLYDE LITTLES PATRICIA LASHELLE & WILLIE LEE HILL JR - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/6/20 Instrument: 2020014873

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I AGAINST DEFTS - 2/4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - WILLIE LEE HILL JR ON 1/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - PATRICA LASTELLE ON 1/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - LEROY S CODY ON 1/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - CLYDE LITTLES ON 1/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING LEROY S CODY & WILLIE LEE HILL JR & PATRICIA LASHELLE & CLYDE LITTLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - 5D HILL WILLIE LEE JR O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - 5D CLYDE LITTLES O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - 5D PATRICIA LASHELLE O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - 5D LEORY S CODY O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less