Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 02:42:28 (UTC).

THOMAS R CAMBRE -VS- BRETT GREGORY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 THOMAS R CAMBRE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRETT GREGORY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0703

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS R CAMBRE

Defendants

BRETT GREGORY

MELISSA GREGORY

 

Court Documents

ORDER DETERMINING RENT TO BE DEPOSITED INTO REGISTRY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/25/21

03/25/2021: ORDER DETERMINING RENT TO BE DEPOSITED INTO REGISTRY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/25/21

ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/12/21

04/12/2021: ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/12/21

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/12/21 Instrument: 2021047947

04/12/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/12/21 Instrument: 2021047947

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

04/13/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET

02/25/2021: LANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/26/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C TO SCSO W/MONEY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/12/21 Instrument: 2021047947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ENTERING DEFAULT- JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingTYPE: TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/25/2021 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING RENT TO BE DEPOSITED INTO REGISTRY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCALENDAR: TR HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 03/25/2021 AT 0200PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketTRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 3/25/21 @ 2 PM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20D BRETT GREGORY 3/5/21

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketANSWER & REQUEST FOR HEARING BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D BRETT GREGORY POSTED 2/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D MELISSA GREGORY POSTED 2/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 20D MELISSA GREGORY O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 20D BRETT GREGORY O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D MELISSA GREGORY O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRETT GREGORY O/C TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLANDLORD CARES ACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED AT COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less