This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 19:10:39 (UTC).

THOMAS CZAPLESKI -VS- UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 THOMAS CZAPLESKI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0248

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THOMAS CZAPLESKI

KRISTAL M PRINGLE

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDSEY PARNELL

Defendant Attorney

LISA WHITE

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT PLAN & ORDER

02/02/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

02/02/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 2/9/23

02/13/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 2/9/23

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ATTORNEY LINDSEY A PARNELL COUNSEL FOR PLTF

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ATTORNEY LINDSEY A PARNELL COUNSEL FOR PLTF

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STAC7 3/7/23

03/07/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STAC7 3/7/23

LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

03/07/2023: LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

03/06/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY LISA WHITE ESQ OBO DEFT

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY LISA WHITE ESQ OBO DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

02/28/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STAC7 3/7/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY LISA WHITE ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ATTORNEY LINDSEY A PARNELL COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 2/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less