This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 17:29:20 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC -VS- UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURA

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7271

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA

CHERYL YATES

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS STEVENSON

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL COLGAN

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 11/23/21

11/23/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 11/23/21

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

11/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

11/23/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/23/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER WAIVING PTC & INVOKING RULES - JUDGE SCHOTT 12/19/21

12/20/2021: ORDER WAIVING PTC & INVOKING RULES - JUDGE SCHOTT 12/19/21

JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE ATTENDANCE AT PTC & INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/17/2021: JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE ATTENDANCE AT PTC & INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFT -MICHAEL COLGAN ESQ

12/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFT -MICHAEL COLGAN ESQ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 12/2/21

12/16/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 12/2/21

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

01/18/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING PTC & INVOKING RULES - JUDGE SCHOTT 12/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE ATTENDANCE AT PTC & INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO DEFT -MICHAEL COLGAN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 12/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 11/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE (S) SET FOR 01/05/2022 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kidwell Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLGAN ESQ, MICHAEL