This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 19:00:56 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC -VS- NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2034

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA

WALTER ABELA

Defendant

NATIONWIDE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

ALAN COOPER

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 5/19/22

05/19/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 5/19/22

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

05/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

05/19/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 6/6/22

06/08/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 6/6/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ALAN K COOPER ESQ OBO DEFT

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ALAN K COOPER ESQ OBO DEFT

JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE PTC BY PARTIES

06/16/2022: JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE PTC BY PARTIES

MOTION TO DISMISS & ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

06/15/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS & ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

06/22/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 06/20/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE PTC BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS & ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO 6/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ALAN K COOPER ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 5/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPRE TRIAL SET FOR 06/20/2022 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kidwell Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALAN COOPER