This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 01:05:07 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON -VS- MARIE MCDONALD

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIE MCDONALD. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0239

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

THE BANK OF NEW YORK

STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC BEAR STEARNS ALT A TRUST MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFI

Defendants

MARIE MCDONALD

LUCIAN RANDOLPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY GASSEL

Defendant Attorney

MANDY PAVLAKOS

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/23/23

03/23/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/23/23

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF CASE MGNT ORDER BY PLTF

03/23/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF CASE MGNT ORDER BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLTF RESPONSE TO DEFT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLTF RESPONSE TO DEFT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS LUCIAN RANDOLPH & MARIE MCDONALD

03/21/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS LUCIAN RANDOLPH & MARIE MCDONALD

ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/14/23

03/14/2023: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/14/23

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST OF DOCUMENTS TO PTLF OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY PLTF

03/14/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST OF DOCUMENTS TO PTLF OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY PLTF

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF

03/14/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SP OF MARIE MCDONALD UNK SP OF LUCIAN RANDOLPH TENATN I UNK TENANT TENANT II UNK TENANT UNK TENANT III UNK TENANT & TENANT IV UNK TENANT W/O PREJ BY PLTF

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SP OF MARIE MCDONALD UNK SP OF LUCIAN RANDOLPH TENATN I UNK TENANT TENANT II UNK TENANT UNK TENANT III UNK TENANT & TENANT IV UNK TENANT W/O PREJ BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COMPL ON LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFTS BY PLTF

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COMPL ON LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFTS BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE SHEET

02/01/2023: VALUE SHEET

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

02/01/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

CERTIFICATE OF ORIG NOTE POSSESSION

02/01/2023: CERTIFICATE OF ORIG NOTE POSSESSION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023009408

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023009408

COMPLAINT FILED

02/01/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/01/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/01/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF CASE MGNT ORDER BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/23/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFTS LUCIAN RANDOLPH & MARIE MCDONALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLTF RESPONSE TO DEFT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST OF DOCUMENTS TO PTLF OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 23-10 - JUDGE RUDISILL 3/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF COMPL ON LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS UNK SP OF MARIE MCDONALD UNK SP OF LUCIAN RANDOLPH TENATN I UNK TENANT TENANT II UNK TENANT UNK TENANT III UNK TENANT & TENANT IV UNK TENANT W/O PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT MARIE MCDONALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MARIE MCDONALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2023009408

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ORIG NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less