This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2022 at 12:04:56 (UTC).

TD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION -VS- DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 TD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0141

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC

JUAN CARVAJAL

JUAN A CARVAJAL

JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWRENCE ROCHEFORT

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/30/22 @ 9AM

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/30/22 @ 9AM

MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS DEFENSES & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & JURY TRIAL DEMAND BY PLTF

04/26/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS DEFENSES & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & JURY TRIAL DEMAND BY PLTF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION OR REPLY TO DEFT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

04/06/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION OR REPLY TO DEFT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO PARTIES BY PLTF

03/23/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO PARTIES BY PLTF

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT DAT INTERNATOINAL TRADING INC & JUAN A CARVAJAL

03/17/2022: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT DAT INTERNATOINAL TRADING INC & JUAN A CARVAJAL

LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

03/21/2022: LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 3/20/22

03/21/2022: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 3/20/22

LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

03/21/2022: LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL IS GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 2/26/22

02/28/2022: ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL IS GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 2/26/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFTS

02/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFTS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFTS

02/14/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC 1/27/22

02/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC 1/27/22

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JUAN CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V 1/27/22

02/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JUAN CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V 1/27/22

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/20/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC

2022-01-20 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - JUAN CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V

2022-01-20 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - JUAN CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

01/20/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/30/22 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS DEFENSES & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & JURY TRIAL DEMAND BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION OR REPLY TO DEFT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO PARTIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 3/20/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT DAT INTERNATOINAL TRADING INC & JUAN A CARVAJAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL IS GRANTED - JUDGE STACY 2/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY WALTER F BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED JUAN CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V 1/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC 1/27/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JUAN CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL AKA JUAN A CARVAJAL DEL V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - DAT INTERNATIONAL TRADING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ