Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:43:43 (UTC).

STRATFORD POINT LIMITED PARTNERSH -VS- BRITTANY MCCRAY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 STRATFORD POINT LIMITED PARTNERSH filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRITTANY MCCRAY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0521

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATFORD POINT LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

1700 Old England Loop

Sanford, FL 32771

Defendant

BRITTANY MCCRAY

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

CHECK MAILED $1,050.10 TO JAMES I BARRON III PA

03/13/2020: CHECK MAILED $1,050.10 TO JAMES I BARRON III PA

WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/28/2020

02/27/2020: WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/28/2020

STIPULATION BY PARTIES

03/03/2020: STIPULATION BY PARTIES

MOTION BY PLTF TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT RELEASE THE FUNDS & DISMISS CASE BY PLTF

03/03/2020: MOTION BY PLTF TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT RELEASE THE FUNDS & DISMISS CASE BY PLTF

ORDER OF DISMISSAL SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING STIP & RELEASING FUNDS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/3/20 Instrument: 2020023969

03/03/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING STIP & RELEASING FUNDS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/3/20 Instrument: 2020023969

REQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT

03/04/2020: REQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT R# 2020-067-002584 ($1,050.00 REGISTRY + $23.25 CLERKS FEE) BY BRITTANY MCCRAY

02/21/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT R# 2020-067-002584 ($1,050.00 REGISTRY + $23.25 CLERKS FEE) BY BRITTANY MCCRAY

ANSWER BY DEFT

02/21/2020: ANSWER BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D BRITTANY MCCRAY PSTD 2/15/20

02/24/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D BRITTANY MCCRAY PSTD 2/15/20

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

02/25/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/25/20

02/25/2020: ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/25/20

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO BRITTANY MCCRAY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/25/20 Instrument: 2020021316

02/25/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO BRITTANY MCCRAY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/25/20 Instrument: 2020021316

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/17/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/12/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRITTANY MCCRAY

02/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRITTANY MCCRAY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK MAILED $1,050.10 TO JAMES I BARRON III PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING STIP & RELEASING FUNDS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/3/20 Instrument: 2020023969

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION BY PLTF TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT RELEASE THE FUNDS & DISMISS CASE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO BRITTANY MCCRAY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/25/20 Instrument: 2020021316

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D BRITTANY MCCRAY PSTD 2/15/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT R# 2020-067-002584 ($1,050.00 REGISTRY + $23.25 CLERKS FEE) BY BRITTANY MCCRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D BRITTANY MCCRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON