This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 17:52:22 (UTC).

STARLIGHT BAPTIST CHURCH INC -VS- GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 STARLIGHT BAPTIST CHURCH INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2600

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARLIGHT BAPTIST CHURCH INC

Defendant

GUIDEONE ELITE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM PARKS

Defendant Attorney

ERICA WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/01/2021: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

10/29/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BY PLTF

10/29/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

10/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY WILLIAM F PARKS OBO PLTF

10/29/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY WILLIAM F PARKS OBO PLTF

COMPLAINT FILED

10/29/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - GUIDEONE ELITE INS CO

10/29/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - GUIDEONE ELITE INS CO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/29/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GUIDELINEELITE INS CO ON 11/10/21

11/10/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GUIDELINEELITE INS CO ON 11/10/21

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

11/30/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT

12/07/2021: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO OPPOSING COUNSEL BY DEFT

12/07/2021: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO OPPOSING COUNSEL BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO MIDDLE DISTRICT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO OPPOSING COUNSEL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - GUIDELINEELITE INS CO ON 11/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY WILLIAM F PARKS OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - GUIDEONE ELITE INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GuideOne Elite Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERICA WILLIAMS