This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/22/2023 at 07:04:19 (UTC).

SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY -VS- ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INSURANCE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0251

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

SOLAR TITE INC

Defendants

ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INSURANCE

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO CIBFL0045288

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO CIBFL0018616

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO CIBFL0029638

NORTH POINTE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW STROJNOWSKI

Defendant Attorneys

ALAN ROSENBERG

MELISSA CUTRONA

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ AS TO DEFT NORTH POINTE INS CO ONLY BY PLTF

05/09/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ AS TO DEFT NORTH POINTE INS CO ONLY BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

04/24/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

04/24/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

04/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCAIL INS CO

04/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCAIL INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERICIAL INSURANCE

03/31/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERICIAL INSURANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS CO INC

04/03/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS CO INC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS

04/04/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

04/04/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

SUMMONS ISSUED - ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS

SUMMONS ISSUED - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

SUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0045288

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0045288

SUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0081616

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0081616

SUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0029638

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0029638

SUMMONS ISSUED - NORTH POINTE INS CO

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - NORTH POINTE INS CO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/02/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

02/02/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ AS TO DEFT NORTH POINTE INS CO ONLY BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCAIL INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS CO INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION BY DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERICIAL INSURANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AGST DEFT ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNITED SPECIALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - NORTH POINTE INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0029638

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0081616

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUB TO POLICY NO CIBFL0045288

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ASCENDANT COMMERCIAL INS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less