This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/28/2023 at 16:23:57 (UTC).

SOMERSET AT SANFORD FARMS HOMEOWN -VS- RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 SOMERSET AT SANFORD FARMS HOMEOWN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2399

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOMERSET AT SANFORD FARMS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS

CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JARED BLOCK

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT PLAN & ORDER

10/07/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT PLAN & ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022113584

2022-10-07 00:00:00 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022113584

SUMMONS ISSUED - CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS

2022-10-07 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS

SUMMONS ISSUED - RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS

2022-10-07 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS

VALUE SHEET

10/07/2022: VALUE SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

10/07/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS 10/19/22

10/20/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS 10/19/22

NOTICE OF SERVICE - RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS 10/19/22

10/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE - RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS 10/19/22

ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION TO DISMISS W/O PREJ - JUDGE STACY 12/24/22 Instrument: 2022138425

12/27/2022: ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION TO DISMISS W/O PREJ - JUDGE STACY 12/24/22 Instrument: 2022138425

LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

12/27/2022: LETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION & TO DISMISS W/O PREJ BY PLTF

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION & TO DISMISS W/O PREJ BY PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION TO DISMISS W/O PREJ - JUDGE STACY 12/24/22 Instrument: 2022138425

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO HONORABLE JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION & TO DISMISS W/O PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS 10/19/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE - RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS 10/19/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2022113584

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CALANDRA DENYS PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - RODNEY DAMON PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less