Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 14:12:43 (UTC).

SHARON MEEKS -VS- PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 SHARON MEEKS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA D. SOUTO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0113

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA D. SOUTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARON MEEKS

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL VAUGHN

Defendant Attorney

JERAMY BEASLEY

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

03/16/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

02/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

02/26/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

02/26/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

02/14/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO 1/22/20

01/31/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO 1/22/20

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

02/11/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY JERAMY C BEASLEY ESQ OBO DEFT

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY JERAMY C BEASLEY ESQ OBO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

02/11/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/20/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/20/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2020: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

01/20/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY JERAMY C BEASLEY ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO 1/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant