Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:44:28 (UTC).

SEMINOLE COUNTY PORT AUTHORITY -VS- G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 SEMINOLE COUNTY PORT AUTHORITY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against G C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0423

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEMINOLE COUNTY PORT AUTHORITY

230 N. Park Avenue

Sanford, FL 32771

Defendants

G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

4421 Schilke Way, Stes 100 & 104

Sanford, FL 32771

REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN COOVER

 

Court Documents

WRIT NOT ISSUED- ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH FINAL JUDGMENT 3/10/20

03/09/2020: WRIT NOT ISSUED- ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH FINAL JUDGMENT 3/10/20

WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/13/20

03/11/2020: WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/13/20

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/3/20 Instrument: 2020023968

03/03/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/3/20 Instrument: 2020023968

WRIT

03/04/2020: WRIT

WRIT

03/04/2020: WRIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT 5 DAY- AGAINST G & C WELDING LLC

02/19/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT 5 DAY- AGAINST G & C WELDING LLC

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST G & C WELDING SPECIALIST, LLC (5-DAY)02/21/2020

02/19/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST G & C WELDING SPECIALIST, LLC (5-DAY)02/21/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D G&C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC PST 2/10/20

02/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D G&C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC PST 2/10/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D G& C WELDING SPECIALIST PSTD 2/10/20

02/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D G& C WELDING SPECIALIST PSTD 2/10/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER-HALLS PSTD 2/10/20

02/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER-HALLS PSTD 2/10/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS PSTD 2/10/20

02/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS PSTD 2/10/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20D G&C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC 2/12/20

02/14/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20D G&C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC 2/12/20

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER-HALLS 2/12/20

02/14/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER-HALLS 2/12/20

COMPLAINT FILED

02/03/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 20D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

02/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 20D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

SUMMONS ISSUED 20D G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

02/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 20D G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

02/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

02/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 3/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT NOT ISSUED- ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH FINAL JUDGMENT 3/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT NOT ISSUED- ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH FINAL JUDGMENT 3/6/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT NOT ISSUED-ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH FINAL JUDGMENT 3/6/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/3/20 Instrument: 2020023968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST G & C WELDING SPECIALIST, LLC (5-DAY)02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT 5 DAY- AGAINST G & C WELDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER-HALLS 2/12/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20D G&C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC 2/12/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS PSTD 2/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER-HALLS PSTD 2/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D G& C WELDING SPECIALIST PSTD 2/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 5D G&C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC PST 2/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 20D G & C WELDING SPECIALIST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 20D REGINA LAVERNE CROMER HALLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHEN COOVER