Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 13:39:12 (UTC).

SAN JOSE APTS OF SEMINOLE LTD -VS- RUTH ROSADO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 SAN JOSE APTS OF SEMINOLE LTD filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RUTH ROSADO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0464

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAN JOSE APTS OF SEMINOLE LTD

2353 Winterwoods Blvd

Winter Park, FL 32792

SAN JOSE APTS

Defendant

RUTH ROSADO

Winter Park, FL 32792

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY PLTF

03/10/2020: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY PLTF

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/11/20

03/11/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/11/20

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

03/12/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION BY PLTF

03/04/2020: MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION BY PLTF

ORDER SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025269

03/05/2020: ORDER SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025269

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION + $200 COURT COSTS AS TO RUTH ROSADO - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/24/20 Instrument: 2020020795

02/24/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION + $200 COURT COSTS AS TO RUTH ROSADO - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/24/20 Instrument: 2020020795

WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/27/2020

02/26/2020: WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/27/2020

REQUEST TO STOP ALL PROCEEDINGS BY PLTF (FJ & WRIT ALREADY ISSUED)

02/26/2020: REQUEST TO STOP ALL PROCEEDINGS BY PLTF (FJ & WRIT ALREADY ISSUED)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D RUTH ROSADO 2/10/20

02/18/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D RUTH ROSADO 2/10/20

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST RUTH ROSADO 02/20/2020

02/19/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST RUTH ROSADO 02/20/2020

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/12/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/06/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D RUTH ROSADO

02/06/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D RUTH ROSADO

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT & WRIT OF POSSESSION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO STOP ALL PROCEEDINGS BY PLTF (FJ & WRIT ALREADY ISSUED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION + $200 COURT COSTS AS TO RUTH ROSADO - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/24/20 Instrument: 2020020795

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST RUTH ROSADO 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D RUTH ROSADO 2/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D RUTH ROSADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON