Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/13/2021 at 17:31:35 (UTC).

SALWA BOU ALI -VS- DESHUNDA SHANA SHULER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 SALWA BOU ALI filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DESHUNDA SHANA SHULER. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0736

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALWA BOU ALI

Defendant

DESHUNDA SHANA SHULER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTO VAZQUEZ

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY PLTF

04/08/2021: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE &EMAIL OBO PLTF -ROBERTO VAZQUEZ ESQ

03/30/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE &EMAIL OBO PLTF -ROBERTO VAZQUEZ ESQ

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4/1/21 10:30AM

03/30/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4/1/21 10:30AM

TRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 4/1/21 @ 10:30 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/21

03/16/2021: TRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 4/1/21 @ 10:30 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/21

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT BY DEFT

03/12/2021: MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT BY DEFT

ANSWER BY DEFT

03/12/2021: ANSWER BY DEFT

AFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT

03/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D/20D DESHUNDA SHANA SHULER

02/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D/20D DESHUNDA SHANA SHULER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • HearingTYPE: TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 04/01/2021 / 1030 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: JAMES J. DEKLEVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4/1/21 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE &EMAIL OBO PLTF -ROBERTO VAZQUEZ ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCALENDAR: TR HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 04/01/2021 AT 1030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 4/1/21 @ 10:30 AM CTRM B - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT / CDC DECLARATION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE RENT BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D/20D DESHUNDA SHANA SHULER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAZQUEZ ROBERTO M