This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/21/2022 at 14:08:32 (UTC).

SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES AS -VS- JAMES K HIGGINS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES AS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES K HIGGINS. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4326

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABAL POINT COMMUNITY SERVICES ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

JAMES K HIGGINS

SUNTRUST BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

K MATTINGLY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - SUNTRUST BANK

2021-12-16 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - SUNTRUST BANK

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

2021-12-16 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #1

2021-12-16 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE JAMES K HIGGINS

2021-12-16 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE JAMES K HIGGINS

SUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES K HIGGINS

2021-12-16 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES K HIGGINS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2021164752

2021-12-16 00:00:00 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2021164752

COMPLAINT FILED

12/16/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

12/16/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SCHOTT; 12/17/21

12/17/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SCHOTT; 12/17/21

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SUNTRUST BANK 1/5/22

02/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SUNTRUST BANK 1/5/22

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #1

02/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #1

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF JAMES K HIGGINS

02/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF JAMES K HIGGINS

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JAMES K HIGGINS

02/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JAMES K HIGGINS

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #2

02/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #2

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BY PLTF Instrument: 2022026731

03/01/2022: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BY PLTF Instrument: 2022026731

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS BY PLTF Instrument: 2022026731

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SUNTRUST BANK 1/5/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF JAMES K HIGGINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JAMES K HIGGINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE SCHOTT; 12/17/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SUNTRUST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE JAMES K HIGGINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JAMES K HIGGINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2021164752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less