This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 11/13/2022 at 12:47:02 (UTC).

RUPERT BVI LIMITED PARTNERSHIP -VS- KFC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 RUPERT BVI LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KFC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0334

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUPERT BVI LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

KFC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN FOWLER

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN GOTTLIEB

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

02/11/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - KFC CORP

02/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KFC CORP

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

02/11/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - KFC CORPORATION 2/18/22

02/28/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - KFC CORPORATION 2/18/22

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

04/19/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

04/08/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

04/26/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF PLTF - BY DEFT

05/26/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF PLTF - BY DEFT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

07/08/2022: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF PLTF - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - KFC CORPORATION 2/18/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KFC CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gottlieb, Brian D