Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 13:41:36 (UTC).

REVERSE MTG FUNDING LLC -VS- MARGARET L POWELL

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 REVERSE MTG FUNDING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARGARET L POWELL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELANIE CHASE and JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0109

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELANIE CHASE

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MTG FUNDING LLC

100 West Cypress Creek Road, Suite 700

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendants

USA

400 North Tampa Street, Suite 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

MARGARET L POWELL

Winter Springs, FL 32708

FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP

227 N. Bronough Street, Suite 5000

Tallahassee, FL 33201

SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARISSA CHIN DUNCAN

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN RUDY III

KACEE JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

DISCLAIMER CONDITIONAL BY DEFT USA OBO US DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

03/12/2020: DISCLAIMER CONDITIONAL BY DEFT USA OBO US DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

02/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #1

02/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #1

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #2

02/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #2

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP 1/29/20

02/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP 1/29/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL 2/11/20

02/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL 2/11/20

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - USA OBO SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT 1/31/20

02/17/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - USA OBO SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT 1/31/20

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP

01/31/2020: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/15/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020007295

01/15/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020007295

VALUE SHEET

01/15/2020: VALUE SHEET

CERTIFICATE

01/15/2020: CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

01/15/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

01/15/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE OF MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

01/15/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE OF MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

01/15/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketREASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER CONDITIONAL BY DEFT USA OBO US DEPT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - USA OBO SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT 1/31/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL 2/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP 1/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - UNK SP OF MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFT FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - USA OBO SECRETARY OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE OF MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MARGARET L POWELL AKA MARGARET WEEKS POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020007295

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chin-Duncan, Karissa, ESQ.