This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 13:28:47 (UTC).

RAY HARMDIERKS -VS- RAMZEY MUJIER SHEIKH

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 RAY HARMDIERKS filed an Other lawsuit against RAMZEY MUJIER SHEIKH. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. RUDISILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0110

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. RUDISILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY HARMDIERKS

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant

RAMZEY MUJIER SHEIKH

Oviedo, FL 32765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIFFANY FADDIS

Defendant Attorney

ERIC ARCKEY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO PLTF BY DEFT

07/14/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (7)

07/15/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (7)

RESPONSE /OBJECTION TO DEFT REQUEST TO SUBMIT TO COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION BY PLTF

06/29/2020: RESPONSE /OBJECTION TO DEFT REQUEST TO SUBMIT TO COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION BY PLTF

NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLTF - BY DEFT

06/26/2020: NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLTF - BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO PLTF BY DEFT

06/18/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO PLTF BY DEFT

ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE (AMENDED) /PTC ON 11/10/20 @ 1PM & JURY TRIAL DURING (1) WEEK PERIOD BEGINNING 12/14/20 - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/21/20

05/21/2020: ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE (AMENDED) /PTC ON 11/10/20 @ 1PM & JURY TRIAL DURING (1) WEEK PERIOD BEGINNING 12/14/20 - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/21/20

ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE /PTC SEPT 29 2020 @1:00PM/JURY TRIAL DURING THE (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING OCT 19 2020 - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/19/20

05/19/2020: ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE /PTC SEPT 29 2020 @1:00PM/JURY TRIAL DURING THE (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING OCT 19 2020 - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/19/20

JOINT STIPULATION TO MOVE TRIAL DATE BY PARTIES

05/20/2020: JOINT STIPULATION TO MOVE TRIAL DATE BY PARTIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RAY HARMDIERKS ON 6/16/20 @ 1:30PM

05/20/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RAY HARMDIERKS ON 6/16/20 @ 1:30PM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

02/07/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE BY DEFT

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC R ARCKEY OBO DEFT

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC R ARCKEY OBO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PTLF BY DEFT

02/07/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PTLF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLF BY DEFT

02/07/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PTLF BY DEFT

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PTLF BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/19/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

01/19/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - RAMZEY MUJIER SHEIKH

01/19/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - RAMZEY MUJIER SHEIKH

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (7)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE /OBJECTION TO DEFT REQUEST TO SUBMIT TO COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLTF - BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO PLTF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE (AMENDED) /PTC ON 11/10/20 @ 1PM & JURY TRIAL DURING (1) WEEK PERIOD BEGINNING 12/14/20 - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF RAY HARMDIERKS ON 6/16/20 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO MOVE TRIAL DATE BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE /PTC SEPT 29 2020 @1:00PM/JURY TRIAL DURING THE (1) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING OCT 19 2020 - JUDGE RUDISILL 5/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 9/17/20 @ 9:30AM - MEDIATOR CLEM HYLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PTLF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PTLF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PTLF BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC R ARCKEY OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - RAMZEY MUJIER SHEIKH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less