Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/04/2021 at 13:51:12 (UTC).

RAQUEL GONZALEZ RODRIGUEZ -VS- BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 RAQUEL GONZALEZ RODRIGUEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2143

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAQUEL GONZALEZ RODRIGUEZ

Winter Park, FL 32792

Defendants

SANDRA PALKOVIC

Longwood, FL 32779

COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

11380 Prosperity Farms Road, Suite 221E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

HOSSIN MOSADDAD

Winter Springs, FL 32708

CAPITAL HILL REALTY MGNT INC

892 Brightwater Circle

Maitland, FL 32751

PINNACLE PROPERTY INSPECTIONS INC

5980 Jandon Court

Port Orange, FL 32127

BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

156 Wisteria Drive

Longwood, FL 32779

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASHEED ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

NICOLE ELLIS

DAVID COHEN

JEFFREY PARTLOW

HANNAH CLARK

STEPHEN PRICE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED - BROWARD CTY CLERK OF COURT 2/18/21

02/24/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED - BROWARD CTY CLERK OF COURT 2/18/21

RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO BROWARD CTY CLERK OF COURT

02/18/2021: RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO BROWARD CTY CLERK OF COURT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY DAVID S COHEN ESQ OBO DEFT BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

01/05/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY DAVID S COHEN ESQ OBO DEFT BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

MOTION (AMENDED) FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW BY ATTORNEY RASHEED KARIN COUNSEL FOR PLTF

01/11/2021: MOTION (AMENDED) FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW BY ATTORNEY RASHEED KARIN COUNSEL FOR PLTF

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFTS 1ST SET OF INTERROGS & 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT CAPITAL HILL REALTY & MGNT INC

01/21/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFTS 1ST SET OF INTERROGS & 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT CAPITAL HILL REALTY & MGNT INC

REQUEST TO NOT DIMISS CASE BY PLTF

01/22/2021: REQUEST TO NOT DIMISS CASE BY PLTF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL REAL ESTATE LLC & SANDRA PALKOVIC

10/26/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFTS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL REAL ESTATE LLC & SANDRA PALKOVIC

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT HOSSIN MOSADDAD

12/21/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT HOSSIN MOSADDAD

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT HOSSIN MOSADDAD

12/21/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT HOSSIN MOSADDAD

ORDER TO TRANSFER & SEVER TO BROWARD COUNTY - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 12/22/20 Instrument: 2020148221

12/22/2020: ORDER TO TRANSFER & SEVER TO BROWARD COUNTY - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 12/22/20 Instrument: 2020148221

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW BY ATTORNEY RASHEED KARIM ALLEN COUNSEL FOR PLTF

11/18/2020: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW BY ATTORNEY RASHEED KARIM ALLEN COUNSEL FOR PLTF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY STEPHEN H PRICE ESQ OBO DEFT PINNACLE PROPERTY INSPECTIONS INC

11/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY STEPHEN H PRICE ESQ OBO DEFT PINNACLE PROPERTY INSPECTIONS INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY JEFFREY M PARTLOW OBO DEFT CAPITAL HILL REALTY MGNT INC

10/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY JEFFREY M PARTLOW OBO DEFT CAPITAL HILL REALTY MGNT INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/04/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

09/04/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - PINNACLE PROPERTY INSPECTIONS INC

09/04/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - PINNACLE PROPERTY INSPECTIONS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - SANDRA PALKOVIC

09/04/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - SANDRA PALKOVIC

COMPLAINT FILED

09/04/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED ON 5/11/21 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 5/11/21 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 5/10/21 @ 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF HOSSIN MOSADDAD & ANNE MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFTS MOSADDAD & BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED - BROWARD CTY CLERK OF COURT 2/18/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL TO BROWARD CTY CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER-ORDER TO TRANSFER TO BROWARD COUNTY(CASE SEVERED PER ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT CAPITAL HILL REALTY & MGNT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFTS HOSSIN MOSADDAD & BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY NICOLE M ELLIS ESQ OBO DEFTS SANDRA PALKOVIC & COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL REAL ESTATE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY JEFFREY M PARTLOW OBO DEFT CAPITAL HILL REALTY MGNT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SANDRA PALKOVIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - PINNACLE PROPERTY INSPECTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - HOSSIN MOSADDAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CAPITAL HILL REALTY & MGNT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BRIGHT SKY PROPERTIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASHEED ALLEN