This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 17:40:12 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6902

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

DANA SAMUELS

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/27/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/27/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2021-10-27 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/27/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 10/28/21

10/28/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 10/28/21

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

10/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNITED AUTOMOBILE INS CO 11/10/21

11/16/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNITED AUTOMOBILE INS CO 11/10/21

OPEN COURT MINUTES

12/20/2021: OPEN COURT MINUTES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

12/15/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 12/20/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-B 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: B; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UNITED AUTOMOBILE INS CO 11/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 10/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE (S) SET FOR 12/20/2021 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM ENGLAND