This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 02:35:53 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSU

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSU. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7407

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

DAVID BURKETT

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

ISABELLA SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/01/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/01/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/01/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

12/01/2021: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

12/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/01/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

12/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 12/1/21

12/01/2021: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 12/1/21

MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

04/05/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

03/08/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT

03/08/2022: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/09/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

RESPONSE & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY PLTF

03/09/2022: RESPONSE & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES

01/05/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO 12/15/21

12/15/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS CO 12/15/21

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES BY DEFT

12/28/2021: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY ISABELLA SANCHEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

12/28/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY ISABELLA SANCHEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 01/05/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT & DISCOVERY BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY ISABELLA SANCHEZ ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE SCHOTT 12/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PTRL HEARING FOR JUDGE (S) SET FOR 01/05/2022 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISABELLA SANCHEZ