This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 22:06:38 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1247

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

MEGAN SCHMIDT

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF DEFT CORP REP BY PLTF

03/17/2023: REQUEST TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF DEFT CORP REP BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFTS BY PLTF

03/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFTS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFTS BY PLTF

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFTS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFTS BY PLTF

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFTS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-03-17 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/17/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/17/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

03/20/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE BUIE 03/20/23

03/20/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE BUIE 03/20/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CANCELLTION OF PRETRIAL CONFERNECE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER ESQ OBO DEFT

04/20/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CANCELLTION OF PRETRIAL CONFERNECE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER ESQ OBO DEFT

JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - BY PARTIES

04/20/2023: JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - BY PARTIES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - BY DEFT

04/18/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - BY DEFT

04/18/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER ESQ OBO DEFT

04/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER ESQ OBO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 4/3/23

04/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 4/3/23

MOTION TO DISMISS - BY DEFT

05/12/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS - BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

05/12/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 04/24/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CANCELLTION OF PRETRIAL CONFERNECE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE - BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ABRIL MONTERO DOKSER ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 4/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE BUIE 03/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE (S) SET FOR 04/24/2023 AT 0900AM CTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF DEFT CORP REP BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less