This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 22:04:54 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1243

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

EDDIE FISHER

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

TIFFANEY SHAVER

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

05/03/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

05/08/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/17/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/17/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY TIFFANY SHAVER ESQ OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 04/24/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 3/17/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 04/24/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less