This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/07/2023 at 04:00:15 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0414

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

SHAKEEM MILEY

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

AUSTIN YOUNG

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

02/23/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

02/23/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 1/24/23

01/24/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 1/24/23

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

03/20/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY DEFT

03/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

03/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY BY DEFT

03/13/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY BY DEFT

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/01/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF DROPPING OF (8) DEFTS BY PLTF

03/03/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING OF (8) DEFTS BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

03/03/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

03/03/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/03/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/6/23

02/07/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/6/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY AUSTIN YOUNG ESQ OBO DEFTS

02/09/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY AUSTIN YOUNG ESQ OBO DEFTS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING OF (8) DEFTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/01/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 1/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/01/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less