This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 20:06:31 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0154

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

SHEILA HEISS

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALTON GRAY

Defendant Attorney

KYLIE WEAVER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

03/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

03/07/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

03/09/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

03/09/2023: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/6/23

02/07/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/6/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KYLIE C WEAVER ESQ OBO DEFTS

02/08/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KYLIE C WEAVER ESQ OBO DEFTS

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

02/10/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

02/15/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY-PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO/PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO/PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INS CO/PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INS CO/PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO/PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO/PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INS CO/PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY-B

02/20/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY-PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO/PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO/PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INS CO/PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INS CO/PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO/PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO/PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INS CO/PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY-BY PLT

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/01/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/12/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

01/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/01/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY-PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO/PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO/PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INS CO/PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INS CO/PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO/PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO/PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INS CO/PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY-BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE KYLIE C WEAVER ESQ OBO DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 1/12/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/01/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less