This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 23:02:18 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0158

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

BRITTANY COSTELLO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

JAMES LOBERG

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/13/2023

01/13/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/13/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

01/13/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/12/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/12/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/12/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JAMES A LOBERG ESQ OBO DEFTS

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JAMES A LOBERG ESQ OBO DEFTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 1/25/23

01/27/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 1/25/23

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

02/13/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

02/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/04/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/01/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/01/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY JAMES A LOBERG ESQ OBO DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 1/25/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/01/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less