This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/19/2023 at 01:08:48 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0082

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

GABRIEL TORRES

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

RYAN STRATTON

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PLTF

03/11/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

03/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

03/11/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

03/01/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

03/01/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

03/01/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

03/01/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

03/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/06/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

01/09/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/9/23

01/09/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/9/23

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE SCHOTT 1/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 02/13/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less