This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 08:02:50 (UTC).

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC -VS- GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0420

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAPID AUTO GLASS LLC

LANDRY BAGHANA

Defendants

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM SHAW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLTF BY DEFT

05/09/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLTF BY DEFT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS - BY PLTF

03/30/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS - BY PLTF

MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFTS OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY - BY PLTF

03/30/2023: MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFTS OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY - BY PLTF

MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE - BY PLTF

03/30/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE - BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY PLTF

03/30/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

03/21/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS BAD FAILTH ALLEGATIONS - BY DEFT

03/21/2023: MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS BAD FAILTH ALLEGATIONS - BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO TO PLTF

03/15/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO TO PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION -SUPPLEMENTAL BY DEFT

03/15/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION -SUPPLEMENTAL BY DEFT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

01/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

01/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/26/23

01/26/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/26/23

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON PLTF BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO OVERRULE DEFTS OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFTS - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS BAD FAILTH ALLEGATIONS - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION -SUPPLEMENTAL BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO TO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/26/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/01/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less