This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 18:12:17 (UTC).

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC -VS- APARNA ALLENKY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against APARNA ALLENKY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2056

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

CENTEX HOMES

DIVOSTA HOMES LP

Defendants

APARNA ALLENKY

STEVEN EVANS

KATE BUSSEN

LAWRENCE FORRESTER

JOIYA POOLE

ERIC DANIEL HUMMEL

DEANNA MARIE HUMMELL

KAREY E JOHNSON

KHARENE A JOHNSON

MARINA MARCO

HARVIBEN PATEL

NIRMALKUMAR BHAILALBHAL PATEL

WADE VAN ELSWYCK

ALLIANCE BUILDING SOLUTIONS INC

BATTERBEE ROOFING INC

BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE FLORIDA LLC

PREM SAGAR RAO MUNUGOTI

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

MARINA MARCO

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLEN SMITH

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSHUA ZUDAR

M REEDER

HAROLD LANG III

Other Attorneys

PAUL ELLIOTT

ROBIN KEENER

KIMBERLY KELLEY

DANIA SAAVEDRA

JOYCE WU

FAY RYAN

GINGER BOYD

MALLORY THOMAS

ARMANDO RUBIO

PATRICIA MCLEAN

VERONICA GUERRA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT STARR SURPLUS LINES INS CO AS TO THE POLICIES OF INSURANCE ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES INC W/PREJ

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT STARR SURPLUS LINES INS CO AS TO THE POLICIES OF INSURANCE ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES INC W/PREJ

NOTICE OF DROPPING OF DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INS CO AS TO THE POLICIES OF INSURANCE ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES LLC W/PREJ BY PLTFS

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING OF DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INS CO AS TO THE POLICIES OF INSURANCE ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES LLC W/PREJ BY PLTFS

NOTICE OF DROPPING DEFT K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES LLC W/PREJ BY PLTFS

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING DEFT K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES LLC W/PREJ BY PLTFS

LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

02/20/2023: LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (AMENDED) - JUDGE STACY 2/18/23

02/20/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (AMENDED) - JUDGE STACY 2/18/23

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

02/14/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

02/15/2023: LETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 2/14/23

02/15/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 2/14/23

ORDER ON NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS / CAUSE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJ AS TO ERIC DANIEL HUMMELL & DEANNA MARIE HUMMELL - JUDGE STACY 2/4/23

02/06/2023: ORDER ON NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS / CAUSE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJ AS TO ERIC DANIEL HUMMELL & DEANNA MARIE HUMMELL - JUDGE STACY 2/4/23

SUMMONS ISSUED - APARNA ALLENKY

08/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - APARNA ALLENKY

SUMMONS ISSUED - PREM SAGAR RAO MUNUGOTI

08/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PREM SAGAR RAO MUNUGOTI

SUMMONS ISSUED - STEVEN EVANS

08/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - STEVEN EVANS

SUMMONS ISSUED - KATE BUSSEN

08/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KATE BUSSEN

SUMMONS ISSUED - LAWRENCE FORRESTER

08/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - LAWRENCE FORRESTER

SUMMONS ISSUED - JOIYA POOLE

08/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - JOIYA POOLE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

08/30/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

08/30/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (AMENDED) - JUDGE STACY 2/18/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING DEFT K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES LLC W/PREJ BY PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING OF DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS INS CO AS TO THE POLICIES OF INSURANCE ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES LLC W/PREJ BY PLTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT STARR SURPLUS LINES INS CO AS TO THE POLICIES OF INSURANCE ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL & PAINTING SERVICES INC W/PREJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 2/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE STACY RE PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS / CAUSE IS DISMISSED W/O PREJ AS TO ERIC DANIEL HUMMELL & DEANNA MARIE HUMMELL - JUDGE STACY 2/4/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEFT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INS CO MOTION TO DISMISS & COMPEL SEPARATE STATEMENTS BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ERIC DANIEL HUMMEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - JOIYA POOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - LAWRENCE FORRESTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KATE BUSSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - STEVEN EVANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - PREM SAGAR RAO MUNUGOTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - APARNA ALLENKY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less