This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 18:48:59 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 L -VS- MIKEA JACKSON

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 L filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MIKEA JACKSON. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2996

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC

Defendants

MIKEA JACKSON

MELINDA FULLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN KORTE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

08/11/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MIKEA JACKSON

08/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MIKEA JACKSON

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MELINDA FULLER

08/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MELINDA FULLER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MELINDA FULLER 8/15/22 5D

08/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MELINDA FULLER 8/15/22 5D

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - MIKEA JACKSON 8/15/22

08/17/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - MIKEA JACKSON 8/15/22

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($1,125.62 COURT REGISTRY + $24.38 CLERKS FEE) FROM MIKEA JACKSON - R#2022-207-002775

08/24/2022: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($1,125.62 COURT REGISTRY + $24.38 CLERKS FEE) FROM MIKEA JACKSON - R#2022-207-002775

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY BRIAN K KORTE ESQ OBO DEFTS

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY BRIAN K KORTE ESQ OBO DEFTS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

08/22/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BRIAN K KORTE OBO DEFTS

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BRIAN K KORTE OBO DEFTS

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($2,950 COURT REGISTRY + $51.75 CLERKS FEE) FROM MIKEA JACKSON - R#2022-235-002241

08/22/2022: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($2,950 COURT REGISTRY + $51.75 CLERKS FEE) FROM MIKEA JACKSON - R#2022-235-002241

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($1,125.62 COURT REGISTRY + $24.38 CLERKS FEE) FROM MIKEA JACKSON - R#2022-207-002775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY BRIAN K KORTE ESQ OBO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BRIAN K KORTE OBO DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($2,950 COURT REGISTRY + $51.75 CLERKS FEE) FROM MIKEA JACKSON - R#2022-235-002241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MELINDA FULLER 8/15/22 5D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - MIKEA JACKSON 8/15/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D MIKEA JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D MELINDA FULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Korte, Brian K