This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/22/2023 at 04:07:21 (UTC).

PRESTIGE AUTO & TRUCK GLASS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 PRESTIGE AUTO TRUCK GLASS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0495

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRESTIGE AUTO & TRUCK GLASS LLC

AMANDA PARDO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

KADIE FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

04/07/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/20/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL ON 5/10/23 @ 9AM CTRM C

03/23/2023: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL ON 5/10/23 @ 9AM CTRM C

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

03/14/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/03/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STIRKE BY PLTF

03/03/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STIRKE BY PLTF

OBJECTION TO PLTF NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY BY DEFT

02/28/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTF NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY BY DEFT

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

03/01/2023: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS & MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

03/01/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTF 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

02/21/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTF 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTF 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT

02/21/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTF 1ST REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO PLTF 1ST REQUEST FOR ADMISSONS BY DEFT

02/21/2023: OBJECTION TO PLTF 1ST REQUEST FOR ADMISSONS BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT RE DEFTS ALLEGATION THAT IT FULLY COMPLIED WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS TO INVOKE ALLEGED APPRAISAL CLAUSE BY PLTF

02/22/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL TO DEFT RE DEFTS ALLEGATION THAT IT FULLY COMPLIED WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS TO INVOKE ALLEGED APPRAISAL CLAUSE BY PLTF

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY DEFTS MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY & MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL BY PLTF

02/22/2023: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY DEFTS MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY & MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

02/22/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY - SAFELITE SOLUTIONS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 2/10/23

02/15/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO 2/10/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /CANCELLATIN OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KADIE FRANCIS OBO DEFT

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /CANCELLATIN OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY KADIE FRANCIS OBO DEFT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

02/16/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY DEFT

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 05/10/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 05/10/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL ON 5/10/23 @ 9AM CTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/20/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STIRKE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDGE BUIE 1/27/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less