This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 18:23:28 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC -VS- ALINA GUBANOVA

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALINA GUBANOVA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. HERR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1257

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. HERR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ALINA GUBANOVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN CULLEN

Defendant Attorney

WALTER BENENATI

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE HERR

03/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE HERR

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/29/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

03/29/2022: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/29/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ALINA GUBANOVA 4/7/22

04/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ALINA GUBANOVA 4/7/22

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY WALTER BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

04/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY WALTER BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT - JUDGE HERR 5/10/22

05/10/2022: ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT - JUDGE HERR 5/10/22

OPEN COURT MINUTES

05/10/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF

05/09/2022: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF ATTY

06/07/2022: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF ATTY

MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & TO RELEASE LIENS & GARNISHMENTS BY PLTF

06/07/2022: MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & TO RELEASE LIENS & GARNISHMENTS BY PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT & TO RELEASE LIENS & GARNISHMENTS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 05/10/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: MARK E. HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ENTERING DEFAULT - JUDGE HERR 5/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL BY WALTER BENENATI ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ALINA GUBANOVA 4/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [F] on 05/10/2022 at 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ