Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 21:04:13 (UTC).

PEDRO RUIZ -VS- SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 PEDRO RUIZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0861

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEIDA M RIVERA

PEDRO RUIZ

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANCISCO GARCIA

Defendant Attorney

ERIC TOURIAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

03/08/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/08/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/08/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PEDRO RUIZ 6/29/21 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY ERIC V TOURIAN ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketLETTER FOR DEPOSITIONS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY FIRST INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC TOURIAN