Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/16/2021 at 07:32:29 (UTC).

PAUL BLANCHARD -VS- SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 PAUL BLANCHARD filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0707

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAUL BLANCHARD

JEANNINE BLANCHARD

Defendants

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRICK ZURITA

Defendant Attorney

ERIC TOURIAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/18/21 @ 9:30AM

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/18/21 @ 9:30AM

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY PLTFS

06/01/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY PLTFS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/12/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO DBA SECURITY FIRST FL

03/12/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO DBA SECURITY FIRST FL

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

03/12/2021: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

03/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

03/12/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION / PRODUCE TO DEFT

03/12/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION / PRODUCE TO DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SECURITY FIRST INS CO 3/22/21 (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING)

03/24/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SECURITY FIRST INS CO 3/22/21 (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC V TOURIAN OBO DEFT

03/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC V TOURIAN OBO DEFT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ERIC V TOURIAN ESQ OBO DEFT

04/21/2021: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ERIC V TOURIAN ESQ OBO DEFT

MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY PLTFS

04/27/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY PLTFS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

05/06/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

05/06/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

05/06/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

05/06/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

05/06/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

COMPLAINT FILED

03/12/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/18/21 @ 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ERIC V TOURIAN ESQ OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF JEANNINE BLANCHARD BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC V TOURIAN OBO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SECURITY FIRST INS CO 3/22/21 (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION / PRODUCE TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO DBA SECURITY FIRST FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC TOURIAN