This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/07/2023 at 18:19:23 (UTC).

PATRICIA PLACEK -VS- ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 PATRICIA PLACEK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALTAMONTE MALL LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN STACY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2108

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN STACY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA PLACEK

Defendants

ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS INC

GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FLORIDA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER KOBYLINSKI

Defendant Attorneys

CONNOR JENKINS

RICHARDS FORD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL LLC BY PLTF

02/22/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL LLC BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC BY PLTF

02/22/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC BY PLTF

02/22/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC BY PLTF

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION BY DEFTS ALTAMONTE MALL LLC & BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

02/23/2023: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION BY DEFTS ALTAMONTE MALL LLC & BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA PLACEK ON 3/28/23 @ 10AM

02/23/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA PLACEK ON 3/28/23 @ 10AM

NOTICE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF DOCUMMENTS OBTAINED BY DEFT GLOBAL MGNT SOLUTIONS FL INC

02/24/2023: NOTICE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF DOCUMMENTS OBTAINED BY DEFT GLOBAL MGNT SOLUTIONS FL INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC

02/20/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL INC

02/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL INC

PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC

02/20/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/06/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

09/06/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED - ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

09/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

09/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL

09/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES

09/06/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL

09/06/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES

09/06/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

09/06/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF DOCUMMENTS OBTAINED BY DEFT GLOBAL MGNT SOLUTIONS FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PATRICIA PLACEK ON 3/28/23 @ 10AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION BY DEFTS ALTAMONTE MALL LLC & BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL LLC BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT GLOBAL MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS FL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ALTAMONTE MALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ALTAMONTE MALL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less