This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/06/2023 at 10:40:33 (UTC).

PACE CONCRETE INC -VS- ALTA CYPRESS LLC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 PACE CONCRETE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALTA CYPRESS LLC. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2457

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACE CONCRETE INC

Defendants

ALTA CYPRESS LLC

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT SMOTHERS

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER RILEY

 

Court Documents

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

10/13/2022: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - HARCO NATL INS CO

10/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - HARCO NATL INS CO

SUMMONS ISSUED - ALTA CYPRESS LLC

10/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ALTA CYPRESS LLC

COMPLAINT FILED

10/13/2022: COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ALTA CYPRESS LLC 10/17/22

10/21/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ALTA CYPRESS LLC 10/17/22

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

10/21/2022: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - HARCO NATIONAL INS CO 10/18/22

10/21/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - HARCO NATIONAL INS CO 10/18/22

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

10/21/2022: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT HARCO NATIONAL INS CO

11/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT HARCO NATIONAL INS CO

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT ALTA CYPRESS LLC

11/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT ALTA CYPRESS LLC

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ATTORNEY SCOTT A SMOTHERS COUNSEL FOR PLTF

12/28/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ATTORNEY SCOTT A SMOTHERS COUNSEL FOR PLTF

ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 1/12/23

01/12/2023: ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 1/12/23

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ BY PTLF

01/26/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ BY PTLF

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ BY PTLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 1/12/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY ATTORNEY SCOTT A SMOTHERS COUNSEL FOR PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT HARCO NATIONAL INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT ALTA CYPRESS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ALTA CYPRESS LLC 10/17/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - HARCO NATIONAL INS CO 10/18/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - HARCO NATL INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ALTA CYPRESS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less