This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 01:05:23 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC -VS- JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRA L KRAUSE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0531

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEBRA L KRAUSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA ROLFE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

01/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/30/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/30/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

03/20/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

03/16/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/07/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

02/27/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

05/04/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

OPEN COURT MINUTES

05/16/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE BY PLTF

05/15/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE BY PLTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 05/16/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: DEBRA L KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] ON 05/16/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/07/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: DEBRA L KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - JULIO HERNANDEZ GORDILLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] on 03/07/2023 at 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less