********0529
01/30/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Contract - Debt Collection
Not Classified By Court
Seminole, Florida
DEBRA L KRAUSE
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC
JOSEPH M LANGSTON
JOSEPH LANGSTON
AMANDA ROLFE
01/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE
01/30/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
01/30/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM
01/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
02/03/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSPEH M LANGSTON AKA JOSEPH LANGSTON 2/2/23
03/07/2023: STIPULATION BY PARTIES
03/07/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES
02/27/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT
HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/07/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: DEBRA L KRAUSE
[-] Read LessDocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES
[-] Read LessDocketOPEN COURT MINUTES
[-] Read LessDocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSPEH M LANGSTON AKA JOSEPH LANGSTON 2/2/23
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
[-] Read LessDocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] on 03/07/2023 at 0900AM
[-] Read Less