This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 18:03:34 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC -VS- JOSEPH M LANGSTON

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH M LANGSTON. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRA L KRAUSE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0529

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEBRA L KRAUSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendants

JOSEPH M LANGSTON

JOSEPH LANGSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA ROLFE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

01/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

01/30/2023: REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/30/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSPEH M LANGSTON AKA JOSEPH LANGSTON 2/2/23

02/03/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSPEH M LANGSTON AKA JOSEPH LANGSTON 2/2/23

STIPULATION BY PARTIES

03/07/2023: STIPULATION BY PARTIES

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/07/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT

02/27/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/07/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-F 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: F; JUDGE: DEBRA L KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - JOSPEH M LANGSTON AKA JOSEPH LANGSTON 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KRAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] on 03/07/2023 at 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less