Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 09/09/2020 at 13:58:33 (UTC).

NIC GATEWAY ORLANDO LLC -VS- JESSICA HENRIQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 NIC GATEWAY ORLANDO LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JESSICA HENRIQUEZ. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES J. DEKLEVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0439

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES J. DEKLEVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NIC GATEWAY ORLANDO LLC

912 Innovation Way

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

NINE 12 GATEWAY

Defendants

JESSICA HENRIQUEZ

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

TERRANCE WEST

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON III

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

05/12/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

REQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT

03/06/2020: REQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT

CHECK MAILED $1,500.33 TO JAMES I BARRON III PA

03/13/2020: CHECK MAILED $1,500.33 TO JAMES I BARRON III PA

STIPULATION BY PARTIES

03/05/2020: STIPULATION BY PARTIES

MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIP & RELEASE FUNDS BY PLTF

03/05/2020: MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIP & RELEASE FUNDS BY PLTF

ORDER OF DISMISSAL SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING STIP & RELEASING FUNDS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025295

03/05/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING STIP & RELEASING FUNDS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025295

WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/21/2020

02/20/2020: WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/21/2020

EMERGENCY MOTION TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY BY DEFT TERRANCE WEST

02/21/2020: EMERGENCY MOTION TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY BY DEFT TERRANCE WEST

ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/21/20

02/21/2020: ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/21/20

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($500 COURT REGISTRY + $15 CLERK'S FEE) FROM TERRANCE WEST - R#2020-067-002535

02/12/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($500 COURT REGISTRY + $15 CLERK'S FEE) FROM TERRANCE WEST - R#2020-067-002535

ANSWER BY DEFT

02/12/2020: ANSWER BY DEFT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

02/14/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/14/20

02/14/2020: ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/14/20

ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/14/20 (DUPLICATE)

02/14/2020: ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/14/20 (DUPLICATE)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/04/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JESSICA HENRIQUEZ & TERRANCE WEST

02/04/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED 5D JESSICA HENRIQUEZ & TERRANCE WEST

COMPLAINT FILED

02/04/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK MAILED $1,500.33 TO JAMES I BARRON III PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CHECK PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING STIP & RELEASING FUNDS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 3/5/20 Instrument: 2020025295

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT ADOPT STIP & RELEASE FUNDS BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY BY DEFT TERRANCE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING DEFTS REQUEST (ATTACHED) - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D TERRANCE WEST 2/6/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/14/20 (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFTS - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/14/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT ($500 COURT REGISTRY + $15 CLERK'S FEE) FROM TERRANCE WEST - R#2020-067-002535

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 5D JESSICA HENRIQUEZ & TERRANCE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NIC GATEWAY ORLANDO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON