This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 18:31:32 (UTC).

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC -VS- MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1522

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC

Defendant

MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT RE: RECORDING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2022077353

2022-06-30 00:00:00 - AFFIDAVIT RE: RECORDING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2022077353

CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT / INDIANA Instrument: 2022077352

2022-06-30 00:00:00 - CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT / INDIANA Instrument: 2022077352

RECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL TO MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

07/06/2022: RECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL TO MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

07/05/2022: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED TO MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI 7/8/22

07/11/2022: REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED TO MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI 7/8/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED TO MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI 7/8/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL TO MICHAEL MOHAMMAD JAVAHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT RE: RECORDING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2022077353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT / INDIANA Instrument: 2022077352

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextgear Capital, Inc. is a litigant