This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 18:26:06 (UTC).

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC -VS- GERARDO DOMINGO NAZARIO

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GERARDO DOMINGO NAZARIO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2311

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL INC

Defendant

GERARDO DOMINGO NAZARIO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT RE: RECORDING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2022076617

06/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT RE: RECORDING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2022076617

CERTIFIED COPY FOREIGN JUDGMENT / INDIANA Instrument: 2022076616

06/29/2022: CERTIFIED COPY FOREIGN JUDGMENT / INDIANA Instrument: 2022076616

REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED- GERARDO DOMINGO NAZARIO

07/11/2022: REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED- GERARDO DOMINGO NAZARIO

RECEIPT - REGISTERED MAIL

07/05/2022: RECEIPT - REGISTERED MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SERVED- GERARDO DOMINGO NAZARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - REGISTERED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT RE: RECORDING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT Instrument: 2022076617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY FOREIGN JUDGMENT / INDIANA Instrument: 2022076616

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextgear Capital, Inc. is a litigant