Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 14:13:34 (UTC).

NEW RESIDENTIAL MTG LLC -VS- CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 NEW RESIDENTIAL MTG LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER E LILLY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELISSA D. SOUTO and DONNA L. MCINTOSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0263

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELISSA D. SOUTO

DONNA L. MCINTOSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW RESIDENTIAL MTG LLC

55 Beattie Place, Suite 100 Ms 561

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendants

MARGARET LILLY

MARGARET L LILLY

CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

Wesley Chapel, FL 33543

TRAILS OF SEMINOLE HOA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOLLY CAREY

DAVID BYARS

 

Court Documents

OPEN COURT MINUTES FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/27/2020: OPEN COURT MINUTES FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING SEPT 25 2020 @9:00AM

07/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING SEPT 25 2020 @9:00AM

NOTICE OF HEARING 2ND AMENDED 7/27/2020 @ 9:00AM

07/20/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING 2ND AMENDED 7/27/2020 @ 9:00AM

ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS NOTE & ORIG MTG (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF)

05/21/2020: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS NOTE & ORIG MTG (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 7/27/20 @ 9AM

06/05/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 7/27/20 @ 9AM

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PLTF

06/24/2020: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PLTF

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY ON 7/27/20 @ 9AM - JUDGE MCINTOSH 6/24/20

06/24/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY ON 7/27/20 @ 9AM - JUDGE MCINTOSH 6/24/20

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY TO PARTIES BY PLTF

06/25/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY TO PARTIES BY PLTF

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) JUL 27 2020 @9:00AM

06/25/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) JUL 27 2020 @9:00AM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGARET LILLY AKA MARGARET L LILLY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGARET LILLY AKA MARGARET L LILLY

SUMMONS ISSUED - TRAILS OF SEMINOLE HOA INC

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - TRAILS OF SEMINOLE HOA INC

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MARGARET LILLY AKA MARGARET L LILLY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MARGARET LILLY AKA MARGARET L LILLY

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT

COMPLAINT FILED

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020012355

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020012355

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING SEPT 25 2020 @9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 2ND AMENDED 7/27/2020 @ 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketREASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) JUL 27 2020 @9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY TO PARTIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY ON 7/27/20 @ 9AM - JUDGE MCINTOSH 6/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 7/27/20 @ 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS NOTE & ORIG MTG (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING BY PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIG NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Instrument: 2020012355

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE MARGARET LILLY AKA MARGARET L LILLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - UNK SPOUSE CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - TRAILS OF SEMINOLE HOA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - MARGARET LILLY AKA MARGARET L LILLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER E LILLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYARS , DAVID ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carey, Molly E