This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 23:33:47 (UTC).

NEW HORIZONS WELLNESS CENTERS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COM

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 NEW HORIZONS WELLNESS CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COM. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0222

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEW HORIZONS WELLNESS CENTERS LLC

MANUEL COLON

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

BRIDGET BERTELS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF

05/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF

MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUEST FOR MATERIALS & PRIVLIEGED INFORMATION LOG BY DEFT

04/20/2022: MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUEST FOR MATERIALS & PRIVLIEGED INFORMATION LOG BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION INITIAL BY DEFT

04/20/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION INITIAL BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL BY DEFT

04/20/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES UNVERIFIED BY DEFT

04/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES UNVERIFIED BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

04/05/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS BY DEFT

03/18/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS BY DEFT

OPEN COURT MINUTES

02/28/2022: OPEN COURT MINUTES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

02/25/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION -SUPPLEMENTAL- TO DEFT

02/25/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION -SUPPLEMENTAL- TO DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

02/23/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

02/23/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL/EMAIL OBO DEFT -BRIDGET BERTELS ESQ

02/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE /REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL/EMAIL OBO DEFT -BRIDGET BERTELS ESQ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO ON 2/3/22

02/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS CO ON 2/3/22

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/18/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

01/18/2022: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES UNVERIFIED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION SUPPLEMENTAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION INITIAL BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUEST FOR MATERIALS & PRIVLIEGED INFORMATION LOG BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORPORATE REP & ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY & NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingTYPE: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 02/28/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JUDEG SCHOTT 1/18/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPRE TRIAL SET FOR 02/28/2022 AT 0900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW HORIZON WELLNESS CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIDGET BERTELS