This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/23/2023 at 05:01:20 (UTC).

MVCS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 MVCS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0597

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MVCS LLC

SUPERGLASS WINDSHIELD REPAIR

IVY HOLTZ

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

04/19/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT - BY PLTF

03/20/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT - BY PLTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) - BY PLTF

03/20/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (SUPPLEMENTAL) - BY PLTF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY SAFELITE SOLUTIONS - BY PLTF

03/20/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY SAFELITE SOLUTIONS - BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY PLTF

03/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY PLTF

03/20/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - BY PLTF

03/20/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - BY PLTF

OPEN COURT MINUTES

03/20/2023: OPEN COURT MINUTES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

03/22/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY - BY DEFT

03/22/2023: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY - BY DEFT

MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STRIKE - PLTF

03/29/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STRIKE - PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF - BY DEFT

03/08/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF - BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF - BY DEFT

03/08/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF - BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - BY DEFT

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

03/02/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY BY DEFTS

03/02/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY BY DEFTS

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL APPEARANCE OF CORP REP & ALTERNATIVELY MOTION TO STRIKE - PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/20/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPEN COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY SAFELITE SOLUTIONS - BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less