This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 21:06:31 (UTC).

MVCS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 MVCS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0597

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MVCS LLC

SUPERGLASS WINDSHIELD REPAIR

IVY HOLTZ

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

RYAN STRATTON

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

03/08/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF - BY DEFT

03/08/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF - BY DEFT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF - BY DEFT

03/08/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF - BY DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - BY DEFT

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - BY DEFT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

03/02/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY BY DEFTS

03/02/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY BY DEFTS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

03/04/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/13/23

02/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/13/23

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY RYAN S STRATTON ESQ OBO DEFTS

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY RYAN S STRATTON ESQ OBO DEFTS

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/03/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

02/03/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/02/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-02-02 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/20/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO NAME CORRECT ENTITY BY DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY RYAN S STRATTON ESQ OBO DEFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less