This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/31/2023 at 22:10:52 (UTC).

MVCS LLC -VS- PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 MVCS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0580

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MVCS LLC

SUPERGLASS WINDSHIELD REPAIR

PHILLIP PARK

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

TARA KELLY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

02/01/2023: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/01/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/01/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

2023-02-01 00:00:00 - REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/01/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

02/02/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFT BY TARA KELLY ESQ

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFT BY TARA KELLY ESQ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/13/23

02/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/13/23

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

03/06/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

03/30/2023: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY - BY DEFT

03/27/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY - BY DEFT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingType: PRE TRIAL; DATE / TIME: 03/20/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: SEMINOLE COUNTY COURTHOUSE CRTM-C 301 N PARK AVE SANFORD COURT ROOM: C; JUDGE: CARSANDRA BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DEFT BY TARA KELLY ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INS CO 2/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE BUIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 0900AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less