This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 05/09/2023 at 04:02:06 (UTC).

MATTHEU ANGEL TORRES -VS- STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMP

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 MATTHEU ANGEL TORRES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMP. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARSANDRA BUIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0717

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARSANDRA BUIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MATTHEU ANGEL TORRES

LUZ MORALES CAMACHO

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT KRAPF

Defendant Attorney

LYNN ALFANO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

04/06/2023: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

03/31/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

LETTER TO JUDGE BUIE FROM GRANT KRAPF ESQ

03/21/2023: LETTER TO JUDGE BUIE FROM GRANT KRAPF ESQ

ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT (AGREED) - JUDGE BUIE 3/21/23

03/22/2023: ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT (AGREED) - JUDGE BUIE 3/21/23

PRIVILEGE LOG - BY DEFT

03/30/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG - BY DEFT

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY TO CONTINUT SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS - BY DEFT

03/30/2023: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY TO CONTINUT SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS - BY DEFT

DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LYNN S ALFANO OBO DEFT

03/01/2023: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LYNN S ALFANO OBO DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY LYNN S ALFANO OBO DEFT

03/01/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY LYNN S ALFANO OBO DEFT

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM A DEFAULT & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

03/06/2023: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM A DEFAULT & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STATE FARM FL INS CO 2/14/23

02/23/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STATE FARM FL INS CO 2/14/23

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

02/03/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

COMPLAINT FILED

02/02/2023: COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO PLTF -GRANT KRAPF ESQ

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO PLTF -GRANT KRAPF ESQ

NOTICE OF FILING CORRESPONDENCE TO DEFT

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF FILING CORRESPONDENCE TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/02/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM FL INS CO

2023-02-02 00:00:00 - SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM FL INS CO

PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

02/02/2023: PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY TO CONTINUT SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG - BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT (AGREED) - JUDGE BUIE 3/21/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE BUIE FROM GRANT KRAPF ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM A DEFAULT & MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF COMPLAINT BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY LYNN S ALFANO OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LYNN S ALFANO OBO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - STATE FARM FL INS CO 2/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -JUDGE BUIE 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MGNT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM FL INS CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CORRESPONDENCE TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL OBO PLTF -GRANT KRAPF ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less